E | 05/19/2009 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2617 | |
E | 05/08/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2194 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3039 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2146 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2194 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2106 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Record vote | RV#575 | Journal Page: 2563 |
House | 05/06/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2563 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2563 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2526 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2526 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 3805 | Journal Page: 2526 |
House | 04/28/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2009 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1599 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1599 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1170 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1013 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 942 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 942 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 942 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 941 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 941 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 941 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 941 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Hegar | Journal Page: 941 |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 941 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 941 | |
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 880 | |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 628 | |
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 628 | |
Senate | 03/10/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |