Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1711 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 1711


 AN ACT
 relating to the use of reservoirs for sediment control or to satisfy
 certain environmental and safety requirements at surface mining
 operations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (d), Section 11.142, Water Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (d) Without obtaining a permit, a person may construct or
 maintain a reservoir [for the sole purpose of sediment control] as
 part of a surface coal mining operation under Chapter 134, Natural
 Resources Code, if the water in the reservoir is used solely for:
 (1) sediment control; or
 (2)  compliance with applicable laws, rules, or
 regulations relating to fire or dust suppression [the Texas Surface
 Coal Mining and Reclamation Act (Article 5920-11, Vernon's Texas
 Civil Statutes)].
 SECTION 2. The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality
 shall adopt rules to implement Subsection (d), Section 11.142,
 Water Code, as amended by this Act, not later than January 1, 2010.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1711 passed the Senate on
 April 8, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1711 passed the House on
 May 6, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, two present
 not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor