Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1715 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 1715


 AN ACT
 relating to the requirements for a smoke detector in multifamily
 and other residential units.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. This bill is enacted to honor the memory of
 Sephra Burks.
 SECTION 2. Section 92.254, Property Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to read as
 follows:
 (a) A smoke detector must be:
 (1) designed to detect both the visible and invisible
 products of combustion;
 (2) designed with an alarm audible to a person in the
 bedrooms it serves;
 (3) powered by battery, alternating current, or other
 power source as required by local ordinance;
 (4) tested and listed for use as a smoke detector by
 Underwriters Laboratories, Inc., Factory Mutual Research
 Corporation, or United States Testing Company, Inc.; and
 (5) in good working order.
 (a-1)  If requested by a tenant as an accommodation for a
 person with a hearing-impairment disability or as required by law
 as a reasonable accommodation for a person with a
 hearing-impairment disability, a smoke detector must, in addition
 to complying with Subsection (a), be capable of alerting a
 hearing-impaired person in the bedrooms it serves.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect January 1, 2010.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1715 passed the Senate on
 April 17, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 28, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1715 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 20, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 114,
 Nays 22, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor