House | 05/21/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4354 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/15/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3786 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 3434 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3434 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2551 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2096 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2023 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2023 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2023 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2023 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2022 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2022 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2022 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1610 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 629 | |
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 629 | |
Senate | 03/10/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |