E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5155
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6970
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 5080
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5080
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1077
|
Journal Page: 5079
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5044
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6643
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1686
|
Journal Page: 6643
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6643
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR2924
|
Journal Page: 6641
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4843
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4742
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4742
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 6022
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 6022
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5985
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5985
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5985
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4464
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4464
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 4464
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4464
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4463
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4193
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5145
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1376
|
Journal Page: 5145
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5145
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5145
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 5106
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5106
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4877
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4570
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Referred to Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 1655
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1655
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1274
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1141
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1065
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1065
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1065
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1065
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1065
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1065
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1065
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 900
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2009
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 631
|
Senate
|
03/20/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 631
|
Senate
|
03/11/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|