1 | 1 | | S.B. No. 1742 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to the regulation of the discharge of firearms and certain |
---|
6 | 6 | | other weapons by certain municipalities. |
---|
7 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 229, Local Government Code, is amended |
---|
9 | 9 | | by adding Section 229.003 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 10 | | Sec. 229.003. REGULATION OF DISCHARGE OF WEAPON BY CERTAIN |
---|
11 | 11 | | MUNICIPALITIES. (a) This section applies only to a municipality |
---|
12 | 12 | | located wholly or partly in a county: |
---|
13 | 13 | | (1) with a population of 450,000 or more; |
---|
14 | 14 | | (2) in which all or part of a municipality with a |
---|
15 | 15 | | population of one million or more is located; and |
---|
16 | 16 | | (3) that is located adjacent to a county with a |
---|
17 | 17 | | population of two million or more. |
---|
18 | 18 | | (b) Notwithstanding Section 229.002, a municipality may not |
---|
19 | 19 | | apply a regulation relating to the discharge of firearms or other |
---|
20 | 20 | | weapons in the extraterritorial jurisdiction of the municipality or |
---|
21 | 21 | | in an area annexed by the municipality after September 1, 1981, if |
---|
22 | 22 | | the firearm or other weapon is: |
---|
23 | 23 | | (1) a shotgun, air rifle or pistol, BB gun, or bow and |
---|
24 | 24 | | arrow discharged: |
---|
25 | 25 | | (A) on a tract of land of 10 acres or more and: |
---|
26 | 26 | | (i) more than 1,000 feet from: |
---|
27 | 27 | | (a) the property line of a public |
---|
28 | 28 | | tract of land, generally accessible by the public, that is |
---|
29 | 29 | | routinely used for organized sporting or recreational activities or |
---|
30 | 30 | | that has permanent recreational facilities or equipment; and |
---|
31 | 31 | | (b) the property line of a school, |
---|
32 | 32 | | hospital, or commercial day-care facility; |
---|
33 | 33 | | (ii) more than 600 feet from: |
---|
34 | 34 | | (a) the property line of a residential |
---|
35 | 35 | | subdivision; and |
---|
36 | 36 | | (b) the property line of a multifamily |
---|
37 | 37 | | residential complex; and |
---|
38 | 38 | | (iii) more than 150 feet from a residence or |
---|
39 | 39 | | occupied building located on another property; and |
---|
40 | 40 | | (B) in a manner not reasonably expected to cause |
---|
41 | 41 | | a projectile to cross the boundary of the tract; |
---|
42 | 42 | | (2) a center fire or rim fire rifle or pistol of any |
---|
43 | 43 | | caliber discharged: |
---|
44 | 44 | | (A) on a tract of land of 50 acres or more and: |
---|
45 | 45 | | (i) more than 1,000 feet from: |
---|
46 | 46 | | (a) the property line of a public |
---|
47 | 47 | | tract of land, generally accessible by the public, that is |
---|
48 | 48 | | routinely used for organized sporting or recreational activities or |
---|
49 | 49 | | that has permanent recreational facilities or equipment; and |
---|
50 | 50 | | (b) the property line of a school, |
---|
51 | 51 | | hospital, or commercial day-care facility; |
---|
52 | 52 | | (ii) more than 600 feet from: |
---|
53 | 53 | | (a) the property line of a residential |
---|
54 | 54 | | subdivision; and |
---|
55 | 55 | | (b) the property line of a multifamily |
---|
56 | 56 | | residential complex; and |
---|
57 | 57 | | (iii) more than 300 feet from a residence or |
---|
58 | 58 | | occupied building located on another property; and |
---|
59 | 59 | | (B) in a manner not reasonably expected to cause |
---|
60 | 60 | | a projectile to cross the boundary of the tract; or |
---|
61 | 61 | | (3) discharged at a sport shooting range, as defined |
---|
62 | 62 | | by Section 250.001, in a manner not reasonably expected to cause a |
---|
63 | 63 | | projectile to cross the boundary of a tract of land. |
---|
64 | 64 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
65 | 65 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
66 | 66 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
67 | 67 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
68 | 68 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
69 | 69 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
70 | 70 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
71 | 71 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1742 passed the Senate on |
---|
72 | 72 | | April 16, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; |
---|
73 | 73 | | May 29, 2009, Senate refused to concur in House amendment and |
---|
74 | 74 | | requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 30, 2009, House |
---|
75 | 75 | | granted request of the Senate; June 1, 2009, Senate adopted |
---|
76 | 76 | | Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31, |
---|
77 | 77 | | Nays 0. |
---|
78 | 78 | | ______________________________ |
---|
79 | 79 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
80 | 80 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1742 passed the House, with |
---|
81 | 81 | | amendment, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 147, |
---|
82 | 82 | | Nays 1, one present not voting; May 30, 2009, House granted request |
---|
83 | 83 | | of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; |
---|
84 | 84 | | May 31, 2009, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the |
---|
85 | 85 | | following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 4, two present not voting. |
---|
86 | 86 | | ______________________________ |
---|
87 | 87 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
88 | 88 | | Approved: |
---|
89 | 89 | | ______________________________ |
---|
90 | 90 | | Date |
---|
91 | 91 | | ______________________________ |
---|
92 | 92 | | Governor |
---|