Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1415
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Testimony taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 878
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2009
|
Refer to s/c on Flooding & Evacuations by Pres
|
|
Journal Page: 631
|
Senate
|
03/20/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 631
|
Senate
|
03/11/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|