Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1752 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Jackson S.B. No. 1752
22 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2009; March 20, 2009, read
33 first time and referred to Subcommittee on Flooding and
44 Evacuations; April 23, 2009, reported favorably from Committee on
55 Intergovernmental Relations by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0;
66 April 23, 2009, sent to printer.)
77
88
99 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
1010 AN ACT
1111 relating to the powers of certain development corporations related
1212 to Hurricane Ike disaster relief and to the validation of certain
1313 governmental acts or proceedings of counties affected by Hurricane
1414 Ike.
1515 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1616 SECTION 1. Chapter 501, Local Government Code, is amended
1717 by adding Subchapter J to read as follows:
1818 SUBCHAPTER J. HURRICANE IKE DISASTER RELIEF
1919 Sec. 501.451. APPLICABILITY. This subchapter applies only
2020 to a corporation the creation of which was authorized by a unit
2121 wholly or partly located in the Hurricane Ike disaster area, as
2222 defined by Section 704, Heartland Disaster Tax Relief Act of 2008
2323 (Pub. L. No. 110-343).
2424 Sec. 501.452. PROJECTS RELATED TO HURRICANE IKE DISASTER
2525 AREA. For a corporation to which this subchapter applies, in this
2626 subtitle, "project":
2727 (1) includes an undertaking the costs of which are
2828 eligible to be paid from the proceeds of qualified Hurricane Ike
2929 disaster area bonds under Section 704, Heartland Disaster Tax
3030 Relief Act of 2008 (Pub. L. No. 110-343); and
3131 (2) does not include:
3232 (A) a qualified residential rental project, as
3333 defined by Section 142(d), Internal Revenue Code of 1986; or
3434 (B) a project the costs of which are payable from
3535 qualified mortgage bonds, as defined by Section 143, Internal
3636 Revenue Code of 1986.
3737 Sec. 501.453. PROJECTS NOT ADMINISTERED BY ECONOMIC
3838 DEVELOPMENT OFFICE. A project authorized under this subchapter and
3939 bonds issued to pay all or part of the cost of a project under this
4040 subchapter are not subject to the requirements of Subchapter F.
4141 SECTION 2. Title 34, Revised Statutes, is amended by adding
4242 Article 1677 to read as follows:
4343 Art. 1677. GOVERNMENTAL ACTS AND PROCEEDINGS OF COUNTIES
4444 AFFECTED BY HURRICANE IKE
4545 Sec. 1. APPLICATION. This article applies to any county
4646 located in the Hurricane Ike disaster area, as defined by Section
4747 704, Heartland Disaster Tax Relief Act of 2008 (Pub. L. No.
4848 110-343).
4949 Sec. 2. PROCEEDINGS VALIDATED. The governmental acts and
5050 proceedings of a county relating to a bond election that was held
5151 November 4, 2008, and at which the ballot proposition was approved
5252 by a majority of the voters voting on the proposition are validated
5353 as of the dates they occurred. The validation includes the
5454 preparation and wording of the ballot proposition, any action taken
5555 by the county in calling and holding the bond election, and any
5656 other action taken by the county before the effective date of this
5757 article in connection with the issuance of any bonds approved in the
5858 bond election. The acts and proceedings may not be held invalid
5959 because they were not performed in accordance with law. A county
6060 may take any further action or conduct any further proceeding
6161 necessary to complete the issuance of the bonds approved at the bond
6262 election, and, when issued, the bonds are valid and binding
6363 obligations of the county in accordance with the terms of the bonds.
6464 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
6565 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
6666 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
6767 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
6868 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
6969 * * * * *