E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/01/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6896
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4680
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5980
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4512
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4190
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4190
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4190
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4190
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2465
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#875
|
Journal Page: 3726
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3726
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3726
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3697
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Moody
|
Journal Page: 3697
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3697
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB4427
|
Journal Page: 3697
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3301
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Reported favorably as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2669
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2427
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2427
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2212
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1936
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1771
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1771
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1771
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1771
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1771
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1771
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1771
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1226
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 633
|
Senate
|
03/20/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 633
|
Senate
|
03/11/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|