Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1774 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 1774


 AN ACT
 relating to the disposal of certain exhibits used in criminal
 proceedings in certain counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Article 2.21, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by amending Subsections (f) and (i) and adding Subsection
 (f-1) to read as follows:
 (f) Subject to Subsections (g), (h), (i), and (j), a [A]
 clerk [in a county with a population of 1.7 million or more] may
 dispose of an eligible exhibit or may deliver the eligible exhibit
 to the county purchasing agent for disposal as surplus or salvage
 property under Section 263.152, Local Government Code, [on the date
 provided by Subsection (e) of this article] if on the [that] date
 provided by Subsection (e) the clerk has not received a request for
 the exhibit from either the attorney representing the state in the
 case or the attorney representing the defendant.
 (f-1)  Notwithstanding Section 263.156, Local Government
 Code, or any other law, the commissioners court shall remit 50
 percent of any proceeds of the disposal of an eligible exhibit as
 surplus or salvage property as described by Subsection (f), less
 the reasonable expense of keeping the exhibit before disposal and
 the costs of that disposal, to each of the following:
 (1)  the county treasury, to be used only to defray the
 costs incurred by the district clerk of the county for the
 management, maintenance, or destruction of eligible exhibits in the
 county; and
 (2)  the state treasury to the credit of the
 compensation to victims of crime fund established under Subchapter
 B, Chapter 56.
 (i) If a request is not received by a clerk covered by
 Subsection (g) [of this article] before the 31st day after the date
 of notice, the clerk may dispose of the eligible exhibit in the
 manner permitted by this article, including the delivery of the
 eligible exhibit for disposal as surplus or salvage property as
 described by Subsection (f).
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1774 passed the Senate on
 April 30, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 28, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1774 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 15, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor