House
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4315
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Referred to Land & Resource Management
|
|
Journal Page: 3038
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3038
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2454
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2049
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1965
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1965
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1965
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1965
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 1964
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1964
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1964
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA6 Hegar
|
Journal Page: 1964
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1964
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 1962
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 1962
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1962
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Postponed
|
12:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 1896
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 1896
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA4 Duncan
|
Journal Page: 1894
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1894
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1894
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1893
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1893
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1877
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1780
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1763
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 701
|
Senate
|
03/02/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 352
|
Senate
|
02/25/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 329
|
Senate
|
02/11/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 217
|
Senate
|
02/11/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 217
|
Senate
|
02/10/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|