Senate | 04/07/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Reported favorably as amended | Journal Page: 921 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 878 | |
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 639 | |
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 639 | |
Senate | 03/11/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |