Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1831 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Patrick S.B. No. 1831
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2009; March 20, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 7, 2009,
 reported favorably, as amended, by the following vote: Yeas 5,
 Nays 4; April 7, 2009, sent to printer.)


 COMMITTEE AMENDMENT NO. 1 By: Patrick
 Amend S.B. No. 1831 (Introduced version), in SECTION 1 of the
 bill, in added Subsection (e), Section 33.0831, Education Code
 (page 1, line 55, by striking "4A" and substituting "2A".
 COMMITTEE AMENDMENT NO. 2 By: Williams
 Amend S.B. No. 1831 (Introduced version) in SECTION 1 of the
 bill, in added Section 33.0831, Education Code (page 2, between
 lines 3 and 4), by inserting the following:
 (f-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (f), a private school
 participating in league activities during the 2008-2009 school year
 may continue in subsequent school years to compete in any
 applicable public school bracket or division established under that
 subsection and remains eligible for designation as champion or
 award recipient under that bracket or division.
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to participation by private school students in University
 Interscholastic League sponsored activities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 33, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 33.0831 to read as follows:
 Sec. 33.0831.  PARTICIPATION IN UNIVERSITY INTERSCHOLASTIC
 LEAGUE ACTIVITIES.  (a)  In this section, "private school" has the
 meaning assigned by Section 39.033(d).
 (b)  The University Interscholastic League may not deny a
 school or its students the opportunity to become a member of the
 league or otherwise discriminate against a school or its students
 because the school is a private school.
 (c)  This section does not exempt a private school or its
 students from satisfying each rule or eligibility requirement
 imposed by this subchapter or the league for participating in an
 activity or league district sponsored by the league.
 (d)  A private school seeking to participate in a league
 activity or to become a member of a league district shall apply to
 the league on a signed form prescribed by the league. The private
 school must certify its eligibility under this subchapter and
 league rules in the application and must attach proof of
 accreditation. The league may not impose eligibility requirements
 for private schools that exceed the requirements of this subchapter
 or league rules for public schools or require proof of eligibility
 that exceeds the proof required of public schools. On approval of
 an application, the league shall issue a certificate of approval to
 the applicant school. The application and certificate of approval
 are governmental records for purposes of Section 37.10, Penal Code.
 (e)  To determine the appropriate league district in which an
 eligible private school will participate, the league must multiply
 the private school's enrollment by two and place the private school
 in an appropriate league district based on that enrollment figure,
 provided that the private school is placed in a league district not
 lower than the 4A level.
 (f)  For each league activity in which competition results in
 a state championship or state-level award, the league shall
 structure the competition by dividing the competitors at an
 appropriate point in the competition into public school and private
 school brackets or divisions so that at each relevant level of
 competition a public school is designated as public school champion
 or award recipient and a private school is designated as private
 school champion or award recipient.
 (g)  The league may adopt rules designed to discourage an
 eligible private school from recruiting any student to attend the
 school for the purpose of participating in a league activity.  A
 rule adopted under this subsection may not be designed to
 discriminate against an eligible private school.
 (h)  To be eligible under this section, a private school
 must:
 (1)  be accredited by an accrediting organization
 recognized by the agency;
 (2)  not have had its ability or eligibility to
 participate in an association similar to the league compromised,
 revoked, or suspended for violating the rules or codes of that
 association;
 (3) offer a four-year high school curriculum;
 (4) offer interscholastic competition; and
 (5)  require daily student attendance at a specific
 location.
 SECTION 2. This Act applies beginning with the 2010-2011
 school year.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *