Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB185 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R561 CAS-F
 By: Watson S.B. No. 185


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to establishing a commission to prepare and recommend a
 long-range plan for higher education in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter H, Chapter 51, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.4011 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.4011.  COMMISSION TO RECOMMEND LONG-RANGE PLAN FOR
 HIGHER EDUCATION. (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "General academic teaching institution" has the
 meaning assigned by Section 61.003, except that the term does not
 include a public state college.
 (2)  "Institution of higher education," "medical and
 dental unit," "public junior college," "public state college,"
 "public technical institute," and "university system" have the
 meanings assigned by Section 61.003.
 (b)  A commission is established to conduct a study of issues
 relating to the higher education system in this state and to
 recommend for that system a long-range plan to meet the demands of a
 global economy and a growing and diverse population.
 (c) The commission is composed of 20 members as follows:
 (1)  11 persons appointed by the commissioner of higher
 education as follows:
 (A)  a representative of The University of Texas
 System;
 (B)  a representative of The Texas A&M University
 System;
 (C)  a representative of the University of Houston
 System;
 (D)  a representative of the University of North
 Texas System;
 (E)  a representative of the Texas Tech University
 System;
 (F)  a representative of the Texas State
 University System;
 (G)  a representative of the Texas State Technical
 College System;
 (H)  a representative of the leading association
 of Texas junior and community colleges;
 (I)  a representative of the leading association
 of independent colleges and universities in Texas;
 (J)  a student enrolled at a general academic
 teaching institution; and
 (K)  a student enrolled at a public junior
 college;
 (2)  six persons who are not affiliated with a
 particular university system, appointed as follows, with
 consideration given to providing for ethnic, racial, gender, and
 geographic diversity among the members of the commission:
 (A)  two persons appointed by the governor, at
 least one of whom has demonstrated leadership and success in
 business;
 (B)  two persons appointed by the lieutenant
 governor, at least one of whom has demonstrated leadership and
 success in business; and
 (C)  two persons appointed by the speaker of the
 house of representatives, at least one of whom has demonstrated
 leadership and success in business;
 (3)  two members of the Texas Higher Education
 Coordinating Board appointed by the chair of the coordinating
 board; and
 (4) the state demographer.
 (d)  Appointments to the commission under Subsection (c)
 shall be made not later than October 1, 2009.
 (e)  The governor shall designate as the presiding officer
 of the commission a member of the commission who is not affiliated
 with a particular university system or public or private
 institution of higher education.
 (f)  The commission may request from any institution of
 higher education or other state agency assistance or information
 and, to the extent permissible under state and federal law and to
 the extent practicable, the institution or agency shall provide the
 assistance or information requested.
 (g)  The expenses of the commission shall be paid in equal
 amounts from the contingent expense accounts of the senate and the
 house of representatives, or as otherwise agreed to by the
 lieutenant governor and the speaker of the house of
 representatives. Members of the commission serve without
 compensation but are entitled to reimbursement of travel expenses
 incurred in carrying out the commission's duties.
 (h)  The commission may study any issue the commission
 determines to be important to the future of higher education in this
 state, including:
 (1)  incentives, including concurrent enrollment and
 dual credit courses, and related requirements to facilitate
 seamless student transitions between and among high schools, public
 junior colleges, public technical institutes, public state
 colleges, general academic teaching institutions, private and
 independent institutions of higher education, and medical and
 dental units;
 (2)  methods to improve communication and coordination
 between institutions of higher education and the business community
 to:
 (A) create pathways to careers for students; and
 (B)  enhance curricula in a manner that will
 benefit students, businesses, and the overall economy of the state;
 (3)  concerns regarding current and projected student
 enrollment and enrollment capacity at The University of Texas at
 Austin and Texas A&M University in College Station and methods for
 ensuring that those elite institutions remain competitive with
 other public and private flagship institutions of higher education;
 (4)  the creation of additional public flagship
 research institutions of higher education, including studying
 methods for:
 (A)  selecting the locations of those
 institutions, including consideration of the feasibility of
 selecting the locations through:
 (i)  a bidding or other competitive process
 among communities in this state; or
 (ii)  solicitation of proposals from
 existing public or private institutions of higher education,
 businesses, or other appropriate entities; and
 (B)  ensuring that those additional flagship
 institutions admit a qualified and diverse student body;
 (5) methods:
 (A)  that can be used to identify the mission,
 areas of specialization, and unique attributes of each institution
 of higher education; and
 (B)  that the institutions can use to better
 coordinate among themselves and to further develop, enhance, and
 promote their respective missions;
 (6)  criteria for establishment of new graduate
 programs;
 (7)  alternative methods of funding institutions of
 higher education, with emphasis on studying how research
 universities should be funded; and
 (8)  the TEXAS grant, Texas educational opportunity
 grant, tuition equalization grant, and other financial aid
 programs, including whether to add to the TEXAS grant program a
 component that targets students at the preschool and primary and
 secondary school levels to encourage those students to commit to
 and succeed in higher education programs and that may include a
 work-study requirement.
 (i)  Based on the commission's study under Subsection (h),
 the commission shall prepare a report, including findings,
 recommendations, and any proposed legislation the commission
 determines would be beneficial to further the commission's
 recommendations. The report must include recommendations for
 improving financial aid programs to ensure that the maximum number
 of eligible students receive financial aid and that a minimum
 number of students are burdened with debt as a result of attending
 institutions of higher education. Not later than October 1, 2010,
 the commission shall submit the report to the Texas Higher
 Education Coordinating Board and to the governor, the lieutenant
 governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the
 presiding officer of each legislative standing committee or
 subcommittee with jurisdiction over higher education.
 (j) This section expires January 1, 2011.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.