House | 05/15/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/15/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/15/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/14/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3657 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Referred to Energy Resources | Journal Page: 2428 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2428 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2134 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1764 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1691 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1691 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1691 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1690 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1690 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1690 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Amendment withdrawn | Journal Page: 1690 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Watson | Journal Page: 1689 |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1689 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1689 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1689 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 921 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Referred to Government Organization | Journal Page: 683 | |
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 683 | |
Senate | 03/11/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |