E | 05/13/2009 | See remarks for effective date | ||
E | 05/13/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2395 | |
E | 05/05/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2050 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2550 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2048 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2050 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1951 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2247 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Record vote | RV#443 | Journal Page: 2247 |
House | 05/01/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2247 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2247 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2245 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2223 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2223 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2223 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 67 | Journal Page: 2223 |
House | 05/01/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2299 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2203 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 2131 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2131 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1869 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1611 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1389 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1389 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1389 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1388 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1388 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1388 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1387 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1298 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1230 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/12/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/12/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/12/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/12/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 198 | |
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 198 | |
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |