Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB187 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 187


 AN ACT
 relating to a Medicaid buy-in program for certain children with
 disabilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 531.02444, Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.02444. MEDICAID BUY-IN PROGRAMS [PROGRAM] FOR
 CERTAIN PERSONS WITH DISABILITIES. (a) The executive
 commissioner shall develop and implement:
 (1) a Medicaid buy-in program for persons with
 disabilities as authorized by the Ticket to Work and Work
 Incentives Improvement Act of 1999 (Pub. L. No. 106-170) or the
 Balanced Budget Act of 1997 (Pub. L. No. 105-33); and
 (2)  as authorized by the Deficit Reduction Act of 2005
 (Pub. L. No. 109-171), a Medicaid buy-in program for disabled
 children described by 42 U.S.C. Section 1396a(cc)(1) whose family
 incomes do not exceed 300 percent of the applicable federal poverty
 level.
 (b) The executive commissioner shall adopt rules in
 accordance with federal law that provide for:
 (1) eligibility requirements for each [the] program
 described by Subsection (a); and
 (2) requirements for participants in the program to
 pay premiums or cost-sharing payments, subject to Subsection (c).
 (c)  Rules adopted by the executive commissioner under
 Subsection (b) with respect to the program for disabled children
 described by Subsection (a)(2) must require a participant to pay
 monthly premiums according to a sliding scale that is based on
 family income, subject to the requirements of 42 U.S.C. Sections
 1396o(i)(2) and (3).
 SECTION 2. Not later than December 1, 2009, the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
 develop and implement the Medicaid buy-in program for disabled
 children under Section 531.02444, Government Code, as amended by
 this Act.
 SECTION 3. If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 4. This Act does not make an appropriation. This
 Act takes effect only if a specific appropriation for the
 implementation of the Act is provided in a general appropriations
 act of the 81st Legislature.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 187 passed the Senate on
 April 23, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 187 passed the House on
 May 1, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 124, Nays 6, one present
 not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor