Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1943 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: West S.B. No. 1943
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2009; March 24, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 20, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 3, Nays 0;
 April 20, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1943 By: West


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to state and municipal actions to ensure compliance with
 fair housing requirements.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 301, Property Code, is amended by adding
 Subchapter J to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER J.  STATE AND MUNICIPAL ACTIONS FOR
 FAIR HOUSING
 Sec. 301.201.  ADMINISTRATION OF STATE PROGRAMS AND
 ACTIVITIES RELATING TO HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT.  Each state
 agency shall administer state programs and activities relating to
 housing and urban development in a manner that affirmatively
 furthers the goals of fair housing under this chapter.
 Sec. 301.202.  ADMINISTRATION OF MUNICIPAL PROGRAMS AND
 ACTIVITIES RELATING TO HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT.  Each
 municipality shall administer municipal programs and activities
 relating to housing and urban development in a manner that
 affirmatively furthers the goals of fair housing under this
 chapter.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *