House
|
05/22/2009
|
1 hr. notice-to suspend rules
|
|
Journal Page: 4334
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3175
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2207
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2207
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1679
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1354
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1278
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1278
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1278
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1277
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1277
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1277
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1277
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Van de Putte
|
Journal Page: 1277
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1277
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1276
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Motion withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 1188
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Motion to suspend regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1188
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 1066
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1017
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 921
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 692
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 692
|
Senate
|
03/12/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|