Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1961 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 81R6651 JTS-D
22 By: Lucio S.B. No. 1961
33
44
55 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
66 AN ACT
77 relating to annexation by and disannexation from certain
88 municipalities.
99 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1010 SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 43, Local Government Code,
1111 is amended by adding Section 43.0547 to read as follows:
1212 Sec. 43.0547. COMPACTNESS REQUIREMENT FOR ANNEXATION IN
1313 CERTAIN COUNTIES. (a) Notwithstanding any other law, a
1414 municipality in a county that contains an international border and
1515 borders the Gulf of Mexico may not annex an area unless:
1616 (1) the area is compact; and
1717 (2) the addition of the area to the municipality
1818 serves the goal of creating a single compact municipal area.
1919 (b) For purposes of this section, the area to be annexed is
2020 compact if it is concentrated in a single area. The addition of an
2121 area to a municipality serves the goal of creating a single compact
2222 municipal area if the action does not create enclaves, pockets, or
2323 finger areas.
2424 SECTION 2. Subchapter C, Chapter 43, Local Government Code,
2525 is amended by adding Section 43.058 to read as follows:
2626 Sec. 43.058. PROHIBITION AGAINST ANNEXATION TO SURROUND
2727 MUNICIPALITY IN CERTAIN COUNTIES. A municipality in a county that
2828 contains an international border and borders the Gulf of Mexico may
2929 not annex an area if the annexation or the resulting expansion of
3030 the annexing municipality's extraterritorial jurisdiction will
3131 cause another municipality to be entirely surrounded by the
3232 annexing municipality or the extraterritorial jurisdiction of the
3333 annexing municipality.
3434 SECTION 3. Subchapter Z, Chapter 43, Local Government Code,
3535 is amended by adding Section 43.908 to read as follows:
3636 Sec. 43.908. REQUIRED ANNEXATION BY AND DISANNEXATION FROM
3737 CERTAIN MUNICIPALITIES. (a) A municipality in a county that
3838 contains an international border and borders the Gulf of Mexico
3939 shall:
4040 (1) not later than December 1, 2009, include in the
4141 municipality's annexation plan each unincorporated area that is
4242 entirely surrounded by the incorporated territory of the
4343 municipality; and
4444 (2) not later than December 1, 2012, annex each area
4545 described by Subdivision (1).
4646 (b) Not later than January 1, 2010, a municipality described
4747 by Subsection (a) shall disannex each area that was annexed by the
4848 municipality on or after January 1, 2002, unless:
4949 (1) the area is compact; and
5050 (2) the addition of the area to the municipality
5151 serves the goal of creating a single compact municipal area.
5252 (c) For purposes of this section, the area to be annexed is
5353 compact if it is concentrated in a single area. The addition of an
5454 area to a municipality serves the goal of creating a single compact
5555 municipal area if the action does not create enclaves, pockets, or
5656 finger areas.
5757 (d) This section expires September 1, 2013.
5858 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
5959 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
6060 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
6161 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
6262 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.