Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1961 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R6651 JTS-D
 By: Lucio S.B. No. 1961


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to annexation by and disannexation from certain
 municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 43, Local Government Code,
 is amended by adding Section 43.0547 to read as follows:
 Sec. 43.0547.  COMPACTNESS REQUIREMENT FOR ANNEXATION IN
 CERTAIN COUNTIES. (a)  Notwithstanding any other law, a
 municipality in a county that contains an international border and
 borders the Gulf of Mexico may not annex an area unless:
 (1) the area is compact; and
 (2)  the addition of the area to the municipality
 serves the goal of creating a single compact municipal area.
 (b)  For purposes of this section, the area to be annexed is
 compact if it is concentrated in a single area. The addition of an
 area to a municipality serves the goal of creating a single compact
 municipal area if the action does not create enclaves, pockets, or
 finger areas.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter C, Chapter 43, Local Government Code,
 is amended by adding Section 43.058 to read as follows:
 Sec. 43.058.  PROHIBITION AGAINST ANNEXATION TO SURROUND
 MUNICIPALITY IN CERTAIN COUNTIES. A municipality in a county that
 contains an international border and borders the Gulf of Mexico may
 not annex an area if the annexation or the resulting expansion of
 the annexing municipality's extraterritorial jurisdiction will
 cause another municipality to be entirely surrounded by the
 annexing municipality or the extraterritorial jurisdiction of the
 annexing municipality.
 SECTION 3. Subchapter Z, Chapter 43, Local Government Code,
 is amended by adding Section 43.908 to read as follows:
 Sec. 43.908.  REQUIRED ANNEXATION BY AND DISANNEXATION FROM
 CERTAIN MUNICIPALITIES. (a) A municipality in a county that
 contains an international border and borders the Gulf of Mexico
 shall:
 (1)  not later than December 1, 2009, include in the
 municipality's annexation plan each unincorporated area that is
 entirely surrounded by the incorporated territory of the
 municipality; and
 (2)  not later than December 1, 2012, annex each area
 described by Subdivision (1).
 (b)  Not later than January 1, 2010, a municipality described
 by Subsection (a) shall disannex each area that was annexed by the
 municipality on or after January 1, 2002, unless:
 (1) the area is compact; and
 (2)  the addition of the area to the municipality
 serves the goal of creating a single compact municipal area.
 (c)  For purposes of this section, the area to be annexed is
 compact if it is concentrated in a single area. The addition of an
 area to a municipality serves the goal of creating a single compact
 municipal area if the action does not create enclaves, pockets, or
 finger areas.
 (d) This section expires September 1, 2013.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.