Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB202 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 202


 AN ACT
 relating to provisional licensing of physicians to practice in
 underserved areas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 155, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 155.101 to read as follows:
 Sec. 155.101.  PROVISIONAL LICENSE TO PRACTICE IN CERTAIN
 AREAS.  (a)  On application, the board shall grant a provisional
 license to practice medicine in a location described by Subsection
 (e) to an applicant for a license under this subtitle who is
 licensed in good standing as a physician in another state.
 (b)  The board may not grant a provisional license under this
 section to an applicant who:
 (1)  has had a medical license suspended or revoked by
 another state or a Canadian province; or
 (2)  holds a medical license issued by another state or
 a Canadian province that is subject to a restriction, disciplinary
 order, or probationary order.
 (c) The provisional license applicant must:
 (1)  have passed a national or other examination
 recognized by the board relating to the practice of medicine within
 the number of attempts allowed under Section 155.056;
 (2)  submit information to enable the board to conduct
 a criminal background check as required by the board; and
 (3)  be sponsored by a person licensed under this
 subtitle with whom the provisional license holder may practice
 under this section.
 (d)  The board may excuse an applicant for a provisional
 license from the requirement of Subsection (c)(3) if the board
 determines that compliance with that subsection constitutes a
 hardship to the applicant.
 (e)  A person who holds a provisional license issued under
 this section may only practice medicine in a location:
 (1)  designated by the federal government as a health
 professional shortage area; or
 (2)  designated by the federal or state government as a
 medically underserved area.
 (f) A provisional license expires on the earlier of:
 (1)  the date the board issues the provisional license
 holder a license under this subtitle or denies the provisional
 license holder's application for a license; or
 (2)  the 270th day after the date the provisional
 license was issued.
 (g)  The board shall issue a license under this subtitle to
 the holder of a provisional license under this section if:
 (1)  the provisional license holder passes the
 examination required by Section 155.051; and
 (2)  the provisional license holder satisfies all other
 license requirements under this subtitle.
 SECTION 2. Section 155.101, Occupations Code, as added by
 this Act, applies to an application for a provisional license
 submitted on or after January 1, 2010.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 202 passed the Senate on
 March 19, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 202 passed the House on
 May 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, one
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor