Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2039 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Ellis S.B. No. 2039
22
33
44 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
55 AN ACT
66 relating to requiring certain critical facilities to be capable of
77 operating with alternative electrical power; providing a criminal
88 penalty.
99 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1010 SECTION 1. Subtitle C, Title 5, Business & Commerce Code, is
1111 amended by adding Chapter 106 to read as follows:
1212 CHAPTER 106. ALTERNATIVE ELECTRICAL POWER REQUIREMENTS FOR CERTAIN
1313 SERVICE STATIONS
1414 Sec. 106.001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
1515 (1) "Alternative electrical power" means electrical
1616 power that is provided by one of the following generators or systems
1717 when electrical power from a utility service is interrupted:
1818 (A) an electrical generator;
1919 (B) a combined heat and power system; or
2020 (C) a renewable power system with energy storage.
2121 (2) "Department" means the Department of Agriculture.
2222 (3) "Division" has the meaning assigned by Section
2323 418.004, Government Code.
2424 (4) "Service station" has the meaning assigned by
2525 Section 105.001.
2626 Sec. 106.002. APPLICABILITY OF CHAPTER. (a) This chapter
2727 applies only to a self-service, full-service, or combination of
2828 self-service and full-service service station that:
2929 (1) is located within 100 miles of the Gulf of Mexico
3030 or of a bay or inlet of the gulf;
3131 (2) is located within one-half mile of an interstate
3232 highway or state or federally designated evacuation route; and
3333 (3) has six or more fueling positions.
3434 (b) This chapter applies to a service station described by
3535 Subsection (a) regardless of whether the service station is located
3636 on the grounds of, or is owned by, another business entity that does
3737 not engage in the business of selling motor vehicle fuel to the
3838 public.
3939 (c) This chapter does not apply to:
4040 (1) an automobile dealer;
4141 (2) a person who operates a fleet of motor vehicles; or
4242 (3) a person who sells motor vehicle fuel exclusively
4343 to a fleet of motor vehicles.
4444 Sec. 106.003. ALTERNATIVE ELECTRICAL POWER CAPACITY FOR
4545 SERVICE STATIONS. (a) A service station shall be prewired with an
4646 appropriate transfer switch and be capable of operating all fuel
4747 pumps, dispensing equipment, and life-safety systems using
4848 alternative electrical power.
4949 (b) Installation of appropriate wiring and transfer
5050 switches must be performed by an electrical contractor.
5151 (c) If a local government requires a certificate of
5252 occupancy for completion of construction of a service station, the
5353 local government may not issue a certificate of occupancy to the
5454 service station unless the local government determines that the
5555 service station has the equipment and operational capabilities
5656 required by Subsection (a).
5757 Sec. 106.004. ALTERNATIVE ELECTRICAL POWER REQUIRED. A
5858 service station shall be equipped with alternative electrical power
5959 for use at the station and be capable of operating all fuel pumps,
6060 dispensing equipment, and life-safety systems using alternative
6161 electrical power for a minimum of three days following a disaster.
6262 Sec. 106.005. REQUIRED DOCUMENTS FOR SERVICE STATIONS.
6363 (a) A service station must keep a copy of the documentation of the
6464 installation of appropriate wiring for the operation of alternative
6565 electrical power, including a transfer switch, on-site or at its
6666 corporate headquarters.
6767 (b) A service station must keep a written statement
6868 attesting to the periodic testing and ensured operational capacity
6969 of the equipment.
7070 (c) The documents required by this section must be made
7171 available, on request, to the department or the division.
7272 Sec. 106.006. ADMINISTRATION; RULES. The department shall:
7373 (1) administer and enforce the provisions of this
7474 chapter; and
7575 (2) adopt rules as necessary for the administration
7676 and enforcement of this chapter.
7777 Sec. 106.007. PENALTY. A person who violates this chapter
7878 commits an offense. An offense under this section is a Class C
7979 misdemeanor.
8080 SECTION 2. Section 241.026, Health and Safety Code, is
8181 amended by adding Subsection (g) to read as follows:
8282 (g) The minimum standards adopted by the executive
8383 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission under this
8484 section must require each hospital that is located within 100 miles
8585 of the Gulf of Mexico or of a bay or inlet of the gulf to provide
8686 emergency electrical power for at least three days following a
8787 disaster using alternative electrical power, as defined in Section
8888 106.001, Business and Commerce Code, located on the premises.
8989 SECTION 3. Subchapter E, Chapter 13, Water Code, is amended
9090 by adding Section 13.1395 to read as follows:
9191 Sec. 13.1395. ALTERNATIVE ELECTRICAL POWER. (a) This
9292 section applies only to a retail public utility required to possess
9393 a certificate of convenience and necessity, a district, or an
9494 affected county that provides retail water or sewer utility service
9595 to more than 1,000 customers in a county that is assigned a risk
9696 designation of "high" or "very high" under Subsection (b).
9797 (b) The commission by rule shall assign each county in this
9898 state a level of risk of "low," "moderate," "high," or "very high"
9999 according to that county's likelihood of experiencing a major
100100 disaster, based on historical information regarding the number of
101101 federal disaster declarations that have been declared for the
102102 county.
103103 (c) A retail public utility, district, or affected county to
104104 which this section applies shall incorporate and maintain on-site
105105 alternative electrical power, as defined in Section 106.001,
106106 Business and Commerce Code, capable of ensuring the operation of
107107 the utility's water and sewer systems in a county that is assigned a
108108 risk designation of "high" or "very high" under Subsection (b) for
109109 three days following an extended power outage caused by a major
110110 disaster.
111111 (d) The commission by rule shall establish the minimum
112112 operating standards for alternative electrical power required by
113113 Subsection (c), which must include the minimum operating capacity
114114 that must be maintained during an extended power outage.
115115 SECTION 4. Not later than December 1, 2009, the Texas
116116 Commission on Environmental Quality by rule shall adopt standards
117117 as required by Section 13.1395, Water Code, as added by this Act.
118118 SECTION 5.
119119 county required to incorporate and maintain alternative electrical
120120 power under Section 13.1395, Water Code, as added by this Act, shall
121121 comply with Texas Commission on Environmental Quality rules adopted
122122 under that section not later than January 31, 2010.
123123 SECTION 6. A newly constructed service station that begins
124124 operating on or after the effective date of this Act shall comply
125125 with Chapter 106, Business & Commerce Code, as added by this Act,
126126 beginning on the first day of operation. A service station
127127 operating before the effective date of this Act shall comply with
128128 Chapter 106, Business & Commerce Code, as added by this Act,
129129 beginning on the later of June 1, 2010, or the first day of
130130 operation after replacing a fuel pump.
131131 SECTION 7. Not later than January 1, 2010, the executive
132132 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
133133 adopt the minimum standards required by Sections 241.026(g), Health
134134 and Safety Code, as added by this Act.
135135 SECTION 8. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.