Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2039 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Ellis S.B. No. 2039


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requiring certain critical facilities to be capable of
 operating with alternative electrical power; providing a criminal
 penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subtitle C, Title 5, Business & Commerce Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 106 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 106.  ALTERNATIVE ELECTRICAL POWER REQUIREMENTS FOR CERTAIN
 SERVICE STATIONS
 Sec. 106.001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Alternative electrical power" means electrical
 power that is provided by one of the following generators or systems
 when electrical power from a utility service is interrupted:
 (A) an electrical generator;
 (B) a combined heat and power system; or
 (C) a renewable power system with energy storage.
 (2) "Department" means the Department of Agriculture.
 (3)  "Division" has the meaning assigned by Section
 418.004, Government Code.
 (4)  "Service station" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 105.001.
 Sec. 106.002.  APPLICABILITY OF CHAPTER.  (a)  This chapter
 applies only to a self-service, full-service, or combination of
 self-service and full-service service station that:
 (1)  is located within 100 miles of the Gulf of Mexico
 or of a bay or inlet of the gulf;
 (2)  is located within one-half mile of an interstate
 highway or state or federally designated evacuation route; and
 (3) has six or more fueling positions.
 (b)  This chapter applies to a service station described by
 Subsection (a) regardless of whether the service station is located
 on the grounds of, or is owned by, another business entity that does
 not engage in the business of selling motor vehicle fuel to the
 public.
 (c) This chapter does not apply to:
 (1) an automobile dealer;
 (2) a person who operates a fleet of motor vehicles; or
 (3)  a person who sells motor vehicle fuel exclusively
 to a fleet of motor vehicles.
 Sec. 106.003.  ALTERNATIVE ELECTRICAL POWER CAPACITY FOR
 SERVICE STATIONS.  (a)  A service station shall be prewired with an
 appropriate transfer switch and be capable of operating all fuel
 pumps, dispensing equipment, and life-safety systems using
 alternative electrical power.
 (b)  Installation of appropriate wiring and transfer
 switches must be performed by an electrical contractor.
 (c)  If a local government requires a certificate of
 occupancy for completion of construction of a service station, the
 local government may not issue a certificate of occupancy to the
 service station unless the local government determines that the
 service station has the equipment and operational capabilities
 required by Subsection (a).
 Sec. 106.004.  ALTERNATIVE ELECTRICAL POWER REQUIRED.  A
 service station shall be equipped with alternative electrical power
 for use at the station and be capable of operating all fuel pumps,
 dispensing equipment, and life-safety systems using alternative
 electrical power for a minimum of three days following a disaster.
 Sec. 106.005.  REQUIRED DOCUMENTS FOR SERVICE STATIONS.
 (a)  A service station must keep a copy of the documentation of the
 installation of appropriate wiring for the operation of alternative
 electrical power, including a transfer switch, on-site or at its
 corporate headquarters.
 (b)  A service station must keep a written statement
 attesting to the periodic testing and ensured operational capacity
 of the equipment.
 (c)  The documents required by this section must be made
 available, on request, to the department or the division.
 Sec. 106.006. ADMINISTRATION; RULES. The department shall:
 (1)  administer and enforce the provisions of this
 chapter; and
 (2)  adopt rules as necessary for the administration
 and enforcement of this chapter.
 Sec. 106.007.  PENALTY.  A person who violates this chapter
 commits an offense.  An offense under this section is a Class C
 misdemeanor.
 SECTION 2. Section 241.026, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (g) to read as follows:
 (g)  The minimum standards adopted by the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission under this
 section must require each hospital that is located within 100 miles
 of the Gulf of Mexico or of a bay or inlet of the gulf to provide
 emergency electrical power for at least three days following a
 disaster using alternative electrical power, as defined in Section
 106.001, Business and Commerce Code, located on the premises.
 SECTION 3. Subchapter E, Chapter 13, Water Code, is amended
 by adding Section 13.1395 to read as follows:
 Sec. 13.1395.  ALTERNATIVE ELECTRICAL POWER.  (a)  This
 section applies only to a retail public utility required to possess
 a certificate of convenience and necessity, a district, or an
 affected county that provides retail water or sewer utility service
 to more than 1,000 customers in a county that is assigned a risk
 designation of "high" or "very high" under Subsection (b).
 (b)  The commission by rule shall assign each county in this
 state a level of risk of "low," "moderate," "high," or "very high"
 according to that county's likelihood of experiencing a major
 disaster, based on historical information regarding the number of
 federal disaster declarations that have been declared for the
 county.
 (c)  A retail public utility, district, or affected county to
 which this section applies shall incorporate and maintain on-site
 alternative electrical power, as defined in Section 106.001,
 Business and Commerce Code, capable of ensuring the operation of
 the utility's water and sewer systems in a county that is assigned a
 risk designation of "high" or "very high" under Subsection (b) for
 three days following an extended power outage caused by a major
 disaster.
 (d)  The commission by rule shall establish the minimum
 operating standards for alternative electrical power required by
 Subsection (c), which must include the minimum operating capacity
 that must be maintained during an extended power outage.
 SECTION 4. Not later than December 1, 2009, the Texas
 Commission on Environmental Quality by rule shall adopt standards
 as required by Section 13.1395, Water Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 5.
 county required to incorporate and maintain alternative electrical
 power under Section 13.1395, Water Code, as added by this Act, shall
 comply with Texas Commission on Environmental Quality rules adopted
 under that section not later than January 31, 2010.
 SECTION 6. A newly constructed service station that begins
 operating on or after the effective date of this Act shall comply
 with Chapter 106, Business & Commerce Code, as added by this Act,
 beginning on the first day of operation. A service station
 operating before the effective date of this Act shall comply with
 Chapter 106, Business & Commerce Code, as added by this Act,
 beginning on the later of June 1, 2010, or the first day of
 operation after replacing a fuel pump.
 SECTION 7. Not later than January 1, 2010, the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
 adopt the minimum standards required by Sections 241.026(g), Health
 and Safety Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 8. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.