E | 05/19/2009 | See remarks for effective date | ||
E | 05/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2617 | |
E | 05/07/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2140 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2867 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2117 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2140 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2059 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Record vote | RV#559 | Journal Page: 2475 |
House | 05/05/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2475 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2475 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2414 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2414 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 3986 | Journal Page: 2414 |
House | 04/24/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1872 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 1655 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1655 | |
House | 04/17/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1568 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1141 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Remarks ordered printed | Journal Page: 1082 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1082 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1082 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1082 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1082 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1082 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1082 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Ogden | Journal Page: 1081 |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1081 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1081 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1081 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1012 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Referred to International Relations and Trade | Journal Page: 759 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 759 | |
Senate | 03/12/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |