Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2043 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 2043


 AN ACT
 relating to the closure or modification of certain man-made passes
 between the Gulf of Mexico and inland bays by the commissioner of
 the General Land Office.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter H, Chapter 33, Natural Resources
 Code, is amended by adding Section 33.613 to read as follows:
 Sec. 33.613.  CLOSURE OR MODIFICATION OF CERTAIN MAN-MADE
 PASSES. (a)  Notwithstanding Sections 66.204 and 81.103, Parks and
 Wildlife Code, the commissioner may undertake the closure or
 modification of a man-made pass or its environs between the Gulf of
 Mexico and an inland bay if:
 (1)  the commissioner determines that the pass causes
 or contributes to significant erosion of the shoreline of the
 adjacent beach;
 (2)  the pass is not a public navigational channel
 constructed or maintained by the federal government; and
 (3)  the land office receives legislative
 appropriations or other funding for that purpose.
 (b)  If the closing of a man-made pass under this section
 results in a loss of public recreational opportunities, the
 commissioner shall develop, in consultation with the Parks and
 Wildlife Department and the county and, if applicable, the
 municipality in which the pass is located, and approve a plan to
 mitigate the loss.  In developing the plan, the commissioner is
 strongly encouraged to assess the feasibility of installing fishing
 piers, boat ramps, and other facilities that provide public
 recreational opportunities.  The plan must be presented to the
 public for comment before the commissioner approves it.
 SECTION 2. Not later than January 1, 2011, the commissioner
 of the General Land Office shall submit to the 82nd Legislature a
 report on the progress of the commissioner in implementing any
 mitigation plan approved under Subsection (b), Section 33.613,
 Natural Resources Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3. This Act does not make an appropriation. This
 Act takes effect only if a specific appropriation for the
 implementation of the Act is provided in a general appropriations
 act of the 81st Legislature.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2043 passed the Senate on
 April 16, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2043 passed the House on
 May 5, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 1, one present
 not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor