House | 05/21/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/14/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/14/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/14/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3801 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 2295 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2295 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1928 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1712 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1638 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1638 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1638 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1637 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1637 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1637 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1637 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Williams | Journal Page: 1637 |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1637 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1636 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1353 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 759 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 759 | |
Senate | 03/12/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |