1 | 1 | | By: Uresti S.B. No. 2081 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read |
---|
3 | 3 | | first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental |
---|
4 | 4 | | Relations; April 21, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
5 | 5 | | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; |
---|
6 | 6 | | April 21, 2009, sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2081 By: Gallegos |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
11 | 11 | | AN ACT |
---|
12 | 12 | | relating to reports regarding the provision of emergency ground |
---|
13 | 13 | | ambulance services in counties. |
---|
14 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
15 | 15 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 774, Health and Safety Code, is amended |
---|
16 | 16 | | by adding Section 774.005 to read as follows: |
---|
17 | 17 | | Sec. 774.005. COUNTY SELF-ASSESSMENT OF PROVISION OF |
---|
18 | 18 | | EMERGENCY GROUND AMBULANCE SERVICES. (a) Each county shall |
---|
19 | 19 | | assess the emergency ground ambulance services provided in that |
---|
20 | 20 | | county from all sources that respond to 9-1-1 or other emergency |
---|
21 | 21 | | calls and provide primary emergency response. |
---|
22 | 22 | | (b) The executive commissioner of the Health and Human |
---|
23 | 23 | | Services Commission, in consultation with the commissioner of state |
---|
24 | 24 | | health services, shall adopt rules governing the self-assessment |
---|
25 | 25 | | required by this section. At minimum, the rules must require each |
---|
26 | 26 | | county, in the county's self-assessment, to address: |
---|
27 | 27 | | (1) the minimum training, licensing, or certification |
---|
28 | 28 | | of ambulance personnel; |
---|
29 | 29 | | (2) the staffing of ambulances in the county; |
---|
30 | 30 | | (3) the types of vehicles used as ambulances in the |
---|
31 | 31 | | county; |
---|
32 | 32 | | (4) the type of advanced life support or basic life |
---|
33 | 33 | | support, as defined by Section 773.003, that ambulance personnel |
---|
34 | 34 | | provide; |
---|
35 | 35 | | (5) the local deployment plan for ground ambulance |
---|
36 | 36 | | services; and |
---|
37 | 37 | | (6) other information determined by the executive |
---|
38 | 38 | | commissioner as necessary for inclusion in the county's |
---|
39 | 39 | | self-assessment of emergency ground ambulance services. |
---|
40 | 40 | | (c) A county or municipality may establish reporting |
---|
41 | 41 | | standards for emergency ground ambulance services that are stricter |
---|
42 | 42 | | than those adopted under this section. |
---|
43 | 43 | | (d) A county may adopt an order requiring all ambulance |
---|
44 | 44 | | providers that respond to 9-1-1 or other emergency calls in the |
---|
45 | 45 | | county and provide primary emergency response to submit to the |
---|
46 | 46 | | county information to enable the county to comply with this |
---|
47 | 47 | | section. |
---|
48 | 48 | | (e) A county, emergency services district, or other entity |
---|
49 | 49 | | may operate an emergency ground ambulance service that is operated |
---|
50 | 50 | | in accordance with federal laws, the laws of this state, and other |
---|
51 | 51 | | state and local rules. |
---|
52 | 52 | | (f) Not later than March 1 of each year, each county shall |
---|
53 | 53 | | publish a report on the availability of emergency ground ambulance |
---|
54 | 54 | | services within the county during the previous calendar year based |
---|
55 | 55 | | on the county's self-assessment using factors adopted by the |
---|
56 | 56 | | executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission |
---|
57 | 57 | | under Subsection (b) or by the county under Subsection (c). The |
---|
58 | 58 | | county shall provide the report to the Department of State Health |
---|
59 | 59 | | Services, make the report available on the county's Internet |
---|
60 | 60 | | website, and annually publish a summary of the report, together |
---|
61 | 61 | | with the address of the website containing the report, in a |
---|
62 | 62 | | newspaper of general circulation in the county. If the county does |
---|
63 | 63 | | not operate a website, the county shall publish the report annually |
---|
64 | 64 | | in a newspaper of general circulation in the county. |
---|
65 | 65 | | SECTION 2. (a) The executive commissioner of the Health |
---|
66 | 66 | | and Human Services Commission, in consultation with the |
---|
67 | 67 | | commissioner of state health services, shall adopt rules as |
---|
68 | 68 | | required by Section 774.005, Health and Safety Code, as added by |
---|
69 | 69 | | this Act, not later than January 1, 2010. |
---|
70 | 70 | | (b) Notwithstanding Subsection (f), Section 774.005, Health |
---|
71 | 71 | | and Safety Code, as added by this Act, a county is not required to |
---|
72 | 72 | | publish a report as required by that subsection before March 1, |
---|
73 | 73 | | 2011. |
---|
74 | 74 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
75 | 75 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
76 | 76 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
77 | 77 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
78 | 78 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
79 | 79 | | * * * * * |
---|