Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2081 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Uresti S.B. No. 2081
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 21, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0;
 April 21, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2081 By: Gallegos


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to reports regarding the provision of emergency ground
 ambulance services in counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 774, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Section 774.005 to read as follows:
 Sec. 774.005.  COUNTY SELF-ASSESSMENT OF PROVISION OF
 EMERGENCY GROUND AMBULANCE SERVICES. (a)   Each county shall
 assess the emergency ground ambulance services provided in that
 county from all sources that respond to 9-1-1 or other emergency
 calls and provide primary emergency response.
 (b)  The executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission, in consultation with the commissioner of state
 health services, shall adopt rules governing the self-assessment
 required by this section.  At minimum, the rules must require each
 county, in the county's self-assessment, to address:
 (1)  the minimum training, licensing, or certification
 of ambulance personnel;
 (2) the staffing of ambulances in the county;
 (3)  the types of vehicles used as ambulances in the
 county;
 (4)  the type of advanced life support or basic life
 support, as defined by Section 773.003, that ambulance personnel
 provide;
 (5)  the local deployment plan for ground ambulance
 services; and
 (6)  other information determined by the executive
 commissioner as necessary for inclusion in the county's
 self-assessment of emergency ground ambulance services.
 (c)  A county or municipality may establish reporting
 standards for emergency ground ambulance services that are stricter
 than those adopted under this section.
 (d)  A county may adopt an order requiring all ambulance
 providers that respond to 9-1-1 or other emergency calls in the
 county and provide primary emergency response to submit to the
 county information to enable the county to comply with this
 section.
 (e)  A county, emergency services district, or other entity
 may operate an emergency ground ambulance service that is operated
 in accordance with federal laws, the laws of this state, and other
 state and local rules.
 (f)  Not later than March 1 of each year, each county shall
 publish a report on the availability of emergency ground ambulance
 services within the county during the previous calendar year based
 on the county's self-assessment using factors adopted by the
 executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission
 under Subsection (b) or by the county under Subsection (c).  The
 county shall provide the report to the Department of State Health
 Services, make the report available on the county's Internet
 website, and annually publish a summary of the report, together
 with the address of the website containing the report, in a
 newspaper of general circulation in the county. If the county does
 not operate a website, the county shall publish the report annually
 in a newspaper of general circulation in the county.
 SECTION 2. (a) The executive commissioner of the Health
 and Human Services Commission, in consultation with the
 commissioner of state health services, shall adopt rules as
 required by Section 774.005, Health and Safety Code, as added by
 this Act, not later than January 1, 2010.
 (b) Notwithstanding Subsection (f), Section 774.005, Health
 and Safety Code, as added by this Act, a county is not required to
 publish a report as required by that subsection before March 1,
 2011.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *