Senate | 04/21/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Motion withdrawn | Journal Page: 1183 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Motion to suspend regular order of business | Journal Page: 1183 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 979 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 763 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 763 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |