Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2095 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Wentworth S.B. No. 2095
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland
 Security; April 8, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 1;
 April 8, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2095 By: Wentworth


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requiring a boater education course for certain
 operators of vessels.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsections (a) and (c), Section 31.109, Parks
 and Wildlife Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a) This section applies only to a person who is[:
 [(1) born on or after September 1, 1984; and
 [(2)] operating on the public water of this state:
 (1) [(A)] a vessel powered by a motor of 10 horsepower
 or more; or
 (2) [(B)] a windblown vessel over 14 feet in length.
 (c) The department shall issue a boater identification card
 to a person who has successfully completed:
 (1) a boater education course, including an exit
 examination, approved by the department; or
 (2) a course equivalency examination approved by the
 department.
 SECTION 2. Section 31.110, Parks and Wildlife Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 31.110. EXEMPTION FROM BOATER EDUCATION COURSE
 REQUIREMENT. (a) A person is not required to comply with Section
 31.109 if the person:
 (1) holds a master's, mate's, or operator's license
 issued by the United States Coast Guard;
 (2) is supervised by a person who:
 (A) is otherwise exempt from the requirements of
 Section 31.109 or possesses a boater identification card as
 required by Section 31.109; and
 (B) is at least 18 years of age; or
 (3) [is at least 18 years of age;
 [(4)] is not a resident of this state and has proof
 that the person has successfully completed a boater education
 course or equivalency examination in another state that is approved
 by the department[; or
 [(5) is exempt by rule of the department].
 (b)  A person who is required to complete a boater education
 course under Section 31.109 and who rents a vessel from a vessel
 livery business is temporarily exempt from that requirement for the
 lesser of the period of the rental agreement or seven days if the
 person participates in an orientation for purposes of the rental
 that includes instruction on all applicable state law.  The vessel
 livery business shall keep records regarding the instruction and
 retain those records for a period of not less than one year.
 SECTION 3. The Parks and Wildlife Commission shall adopt
 rules to implement the examination required by Section 31.109,
 Parks and Wildlife Code, as amended by this Act, not later than
 January 1, 2010.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *