Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4728
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4728
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 6021
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 6021
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6035
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6035
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6035
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4668
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4668
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 4668
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4668
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4658
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4194
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5144
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1376
|
Journal Page: 5144
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5144
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5144
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 5090
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5090
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4570
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 3436
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3436
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3174
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2308
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2222
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2222
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2222
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2222
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2222
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2222
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2222
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1012
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 763
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 763
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|