Senate | 04/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1415 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 764 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 764 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |