Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2099 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Wentworth S.B. No. 2099
22 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
33 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
44 Relations; April 23, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
55 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0;
66 April 23, 2009, sent to printer.)
77 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2099 By: Wentworth
88
99
1010 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
1111 AN ACT
1212 relating to a requirement to provide sufficient water pressure for
1313 fire suppression in certain special utility districts.
1414 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1515 SECTION 1. Subsection (a), Section 13.254, Water Code, is
1616 amended to read as follows:
1717 (a) The commission at any time after notice and hearing may,
1818 on its own motion or on receipt of a petition described by
1919 Subsection (a-1), revoke or amend any certificate of public
2020 convenience and necessity with the written consent of the
2121 certificate holder or if it finds that:
2222 (1) the certificate holder has never provided, is no
2323 longer providing, is incapable of providing, or has failed to
2424 provide continuous and adequate service in the area, or part of the
2525 area, covered by the certificate;
2626 (2) in an affected county as defined in Section
2727 16.341, the cost of providing service by the certificate holder is
2828 so prohibitively expensive as to constitute denial of service,
2929 provided that, for commercial developments or for residential
3030 developments started after September 1, 1997, in an affected county
3131 as defined in Section 16.341, the fact that the cost of obtaining
3232 service from the currently certificated retail public utility makes
3333 the development economically unfeasible does not render such cost
3434 prohibitively expensive in the absence of other relevant factors;
3535 (3) the certificate holder has agreed in writing to
3636 allow another retail public utility to provide service within its
3737 service area, except for an interim period, without amending its
3838 certificate; [or]
3939 (4) the certificate holder has failed to file a cease
4040 and desist action pursuant to Section 13.252 within 180 days of the
4141 date that it became aware that another retail public utility was
4242 providing service within its service area, unless the certificate
4343 holder demonstrates good cause for its failure to file such action
4444 within the 180 days; or
4545 (5) the certificate holder has failed to comply with
4646 Section 65.301.
4747 SECTION 2. Subchapter E, Chapter 65, Water Code, is amended
4848 by adding Section 65.301 to read as follows:
4949 Sec. 65.301. WATER PRESSURE ADEQUATE FOR FIRE SUPPRESSION.
5050 (a) This section applies only to a district whose territory
5151 includes land in the corporate limits or extraterritorial
5252 jurisdiction of a municipality with a population of more than
5353 10,000, and only to the district's system serving land in the
5454 corporate limits or extraterritorial jurisdiction of a
5555 municipality.
5656 (b) A district shall maintain and make available for fire
5757 suppression a system that, when tested according to procedures
5858 prescribed by commission rules, complies with the fire-flow
5959 requirements of the latest edition of the International Fire Code.
6060 (c) The commission shall revoke a district's certificate of
6161 convenience and necessity under Section 13.254(a) on finding that
6262 the district is in violation of this section.
6363 SECTION 3. The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality
6464 shall adopt rules as necessary to implement and enforce Section
6565 65.301, Water Code, as added by this Act, as soon as practicable.
6666 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
6767 * * * * *