Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2108 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Uresti S.B. No. 2108
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 April 14, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 10,
 Nays 0; April 14, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the compensation of a member of the board of directors
 of the Bexar-Medina-Atascosa Counties Water Control and
 Improvement District No. 1.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 9007, Special District
 Local Laws Code, is amended by adding Section 9007.055 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 9007.055.  COMPENSATION.  Notwithstanding Section
 49.060(a), Water Code, a director is not entitled to receive a fee
 of more than $150 a month for performing the duties of a director.
 SECTION 2. Section 9007.055, Special District Local Laws
 Code, as added by this Act, applies only to the compensation of a
 member of the board of directors of the Bexar-Medina-Atascosa
 Counties Water Control and Improvement District No. 1 for
 performing the duties of a director on or after the effective date
 of this Act. Compensation for performing the duties of a director
 before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in
 effect when the duties were performed, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. (a) The legal notice of the intention to
 introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this
 Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a
 copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies,
 officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished
 under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313,
 Government Code.
 (b) The governor, one of the required recipients, has
 submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality.
 (c) The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed
 its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
 representatives within the required time.
 (d) All requirements of the constitution and laws of this
 state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect
 to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled
 and accomplished.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *