E
|
05/23/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
05/23/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
E
|
05/15/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2442
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3716
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2400
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2442
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3677
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2387
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2387
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2386
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2386
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2221
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3073
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#722
|
Journal Page: 3072
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3072
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3072
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3001
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3001
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Amended
|
1-S. Turner
|
Journal Page: 3000
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3000
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 3501
|
Journal Page: 3000
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2870
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 2428
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2428
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2008
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1764
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1677
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1677
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1677
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1676
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1676
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1676
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1676
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1226
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 766
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 766
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|