Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2126 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 2126


 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of owners and managers of apartment
 houses to assess a service charge for the submetering of water and
 wastewater services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 13.503, Water Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (c) and (d) and adding Subsection (c-1) to
 read as follows:
 (c) Except as provided by Subsection (c-1), in [In] addition
 to the charges permitted under Subsection (b), the rules shall
 authorize the owner or manager of a manufactured home rental
 community or apartment house [owner or manager] to impose a service
 charge of not more than nine percent of the costs related to
 submetering allocated to each submetered rental or dwelling unit.
 (c-1)  The rules may not authorize the owner or manager of an
 apartment house to impose a service charge under Subsection (c) on a
 resident who:
 (1)  resides in a unit of an apartment house that has
 received an allocation of low income housing tax credits under
 Subchapter DD, Chapter 2306, Government Code; or
 (2)  receives tenant-based voucher assistance under
 Section 8, United States Housing Act of 1937 (42 U.S.C. Section
 1437f).
 (d) For purposes of Subsection (c), "costs related to
 submetering" means water costs as well as any other applicable
 taxes and surcharges that are charged by the retail public utility
 to the owner or manager of a manufactured home rental community or
 apartment house [owner or manager].
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2126 passed the Senate on
 April 28, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 14, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2126 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 11, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 142,
 Nays 3, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor