House | 05/21/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4354 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Referred to Environmental Regulation | Journal Page: 2425 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2425 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2209 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1936 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1767 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1767 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1767 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1767 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1767 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1767 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1767 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1226 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 218 | |
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 218 | |
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |