E | 06/19/2009 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5157 | |
E | 06/01/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5156 | |
House | 05/31/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6896 | |
Senate | 05/30/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4680 | |
Senate | 05/28/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4512 | |
Senate | 05/28/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 4132 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Record vote | RV#1376 | Journal Page: 5144 |
House | 05/27/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 5144 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 5144 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 5090 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 5090 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/25/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/23/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/22/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/22/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4570 | |
House | 05/22/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/22/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/22/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 3170 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3170 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2453 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2096 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2001 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2001 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2001 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2001 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2001 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2001 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2001 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1611 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 768 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 768 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |