Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2178 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 2178


 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment by the commissioner of education of a
 computer lending pilot program for public schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 32, Education Code, is amended by adding
 Subchapter H to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER H.  COMPUTER LENDING PILOT PROGRAM
 Sec. 32.351.  ESTABLISHMENT OF PILOT PROGRAM.  The
 commissioner by rule shall establish a computer lending pilot
 program to provide computers to participating public schools that
 make computers available for use by students and their parents.
 Sec. 32.352.  PILOT PROGRAM ADMINISTRATION.  The
 commissioner shall establish procedures for the administration of
 the pilot program, including procedures for distributing to
 participating public schools:
 (1)  any surplus or salvage data processing equipment
 available for distribution under the pilot program; or
 (2)  computers donated or purchased for that purpose
 with funds from any available source, including a foundation,
 private entity, governmental entity, and institution of higher
 education.
 Sec. 32.353.  ELIGIBLE SCHOOLS.  A public school is eligible
 to participate in the pilot program if:
 (1)  50 percent or more of the students enrolled in the
 school are educationally disadvantaged; and
 (2)  the school operates or agrees to operate a
 computer lending program that:
 (A)  allows students and parents to borrow a
 computer;
 (B)  includes an option for students and parents
 to work toward owning a computer initially borrowed under the
 school's lending program, subject to any applicable legal
 restrictions regarding disposition of the computer involved;
 (C)  provides computer training for students and
 parents; and
 (D)  operates outside regular school hours,
 including operation until at least 7 p.m. on at least three days
 each week.
 Sec. 32.354.  ANNUAL REPORT.  Not later than January 1 of
 each year, the commissioner shall submit a report to the
 legislature regarding the computer lending pilot program
 established under this subchapter.
 Sec. 32.355.  EXPIRATION.  This subchapter expires September
 1, 2014.
 SECTION 2. Section 2175.128, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (a-1) and (b-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), if a disposition of a
 state agency's surplus or salvage data processing equipment is not
 made under Section 2175.125 or 2175.184, the state agency shall
 make the equipment available to the commissioner of education for
 use in the computer lending pilot program established under
 Subchapter H, Chapter 32, Education Code. If the commissioner of
 education declines to take the equipment, the state agency shall
 transfer the equipment in accordance with Subsection (a). The
 state agency may not collect a fee or other reimbursement from the
 commissioner of education for the equipment made available under
 this subsection. This subsection expires September 1, 2014.
 (b-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b), if a disposition of
 the surplus or salvage data processing equipment of a state
 eleemosynary institution or an institution or agency of higher
 education is not made under other law, the institution or agency
 shall make the equipment available to the commissioner of education
 for use in the computer lending pilot program established under
 Subchapter H, Chapter 32, Education Code. If the commissioner of
 education declines to take the equipment, the institution or agency
 shall transfer the equipment in accordance with Subsection (b).
 The state eleemosynary institution or institution or agency of
 higher education may not collect a fee or other reimbursement from
 the commissioner of education for the equipment made available
 under this subsection. This subsection expires September 1, 2014.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2178 passed the Senate on
 May 5, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2178 passed the House on
 May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 1, two
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor