Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2203 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Uresti S.B. No. 2203
22 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
33 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
44 May 1, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
55 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 1, 2009, sent
66 to printer.)
77 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2203 By: Uresti
88
99
1010 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
1111 AN ACT
1212 relating to the qualifications of surgical technologists;
1313 providing penalties.
1414 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1515 SECTION 1. Subtitle B, Title 4, Health and Safety Code, is
1616 amended by adding Chapter 259 to read as follows:
1717 CHAPTER 259. SURGICAL TECHNOLOGISTS
1818 AT HEALTH CARE FACILITIES
1919 Sec. 259.001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
2020 (1) "Department" means the Department of State Health
2121 Services.
2222 (2) "Surgical technologist" means a person who
2323 practices surgical technology.
2424 (3) "Surgical technology" means intraoperative
2525 surgical patient care as follows:
2626 (A) preparing the operating room for surgical
2727 procedures by ensuring that surgical equipment is functioning
2828 properly and safely;
2929 (B) preparing the operating room and the sterile
3030 field for surgical procedures by preparing sterile supplies,
3131 instruments, and equipment using sterile technique;
3232 (C) anticipating the needs of the surgical team
3333 based on knowledge of human anatomy and pathophysiology and how
3434 they relate to the surgical patient and the patient's surgical
3535 procedure;
3636 (D) as directed in an operating room setting,
3737 performing the following tasks at the sterile field:
3838 (i) passing supplies, equipment, or
3939 instruments;
4040 (ii) sponging or suctioning an operative
4141 site;
4242 (iii) preparing and cutting suture
4343 material;
4444 (iv) transferring and pouring irrigation
4545 fluids;
4646 (v) transferring but not administering
4747 drugs within the sterile field;
4848 (vi) handling specimens;
4949 (vii) holding retractors and other
5050 instruments;
5151 (viii) applying electrocautery to clamps on
5252 bleeders;
5353 (ix) connecting drains to suction
5454 apparatus;
5555 (x) applying dressings to closed wounds;
5656 and
5757 (xi) assisting in counting sponges,
5858 needles, supplies, and instruments with the registered nurse
5959 circulator;
6060 (E) cleaning and preparing instruments for
6161 sterilization on completion of the surgery; and
6262 (F) assisting the surgical team with cleaning of
6363 the operating room on completion of the surgery.
6464 Sec. 259.002. REQUIREMENTS FOR PRACTICING SURGICAL
6565 TECHNOLOGY. (a) A health care facility licensed by the department
6666 under this subtitle or owned or operated by the state may not employ
6767 a person to practice surgical technology in that health care
6868 facility unless that person provides evidence that the person:
6969 (1) has successfully completed an accredited
7070 educational program for surgical technologists and holds and
7171 maintains certification as a surgical technologist by:
7272 (A) the National Board of Surgical Technology and
7373 Surgical Assisting or its successor;
7474 (B) the National Center for Competency Testing or
7575 its successor; or
7676 (C) another surgical technologist certification
7777 program approved by the department;
7878 (2) has completed an appropriate training program for
7979 surgical technology in the army, navy, air force, marine corps, or
8080 coast guard of the United States or in the United States Public
8181 Health Service;
8282 (3) was employed to practice surgical technology in a
8383 health care facility before September 1, 2009; or
8484 (4) is in the service of the federal government, to the
8585 extent the person is performing duties related to that service.
8686 (b) Notwithstanding Subsection (a), a health care facility
8787 may employ a person to practice surgical technology at that health
8888 care facility from the date the person graduates from an accredited
8989 educational program for surgical technologists until the 180th day
9090 after the date of graduation. The person may not continue to
9191 practice surgical technology after the 180th day after the date of
9292 graduation without showing documentation to the health care
9393 facility that the person holds and maintains the surgical
9494 technologist certification required by Subsection (a)(1).
9595 (c) Notwithstanding Subsection (a), a health care facility
9696 may employ a surgical technologist who does not meet the
9797 requirements of this section if:
9898 (1) after a diligent and thorough effort has been
9999 made, the health care facility is unable to employ a sufficient
100100 number of qualified surgical technologists who meet the
101101 requirements of this section; and
102102 (2) the health care facility makes a written record of
103103 its efforts under Subdivision (1) and retains the record at the
104104 health care facility.
105105 Sec. 259.003. SUPERVISION OF SURGICAL TECHNOLOGISTS. This
106106 chapter does not repeal or modify any law relating to the
107107 supervision of surgical technologists.
108108 Sec. 259.004. OTHER LICENSED PRACTITIONERS. This chapter
109109 does not prohibit a licensed practitioner from performing a task or
110110 function within the scope of the practitioner's license.
111111 Sec. 259.005. APPLICABILITY. This chapter does not apply
112112 to:
113113 (1) a licensed registered nurse or a licensed
114114 vocational nurse; or
115115 (2) the employment by a health care facility of an
116116 individual whose primary functions include the cleaning or
117117 sterilization of supplies, instruments, equipment, or operating
118118 rooms.
119119 Sec. 259.006. ENFORCEMENT. (a) The department may adopt
120120 rules to administer and enforce this chapter.
121121 (b) A health care facility that violates Section 259.002 is
122122 subject to an administrative penalty, a civil penalty, or other
123123 disciplinary action, as applicable, in the same manner as if the
124124 facility violated the chapter under which the facility is licensed.
125125 SECTION 2. A health care facility is not required to comply
126126 with Section 259.002, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act,
127127 before September 1, 2010.
128128 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
129129 * * * * *