Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2203 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Uresti S.B. No. 2203
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
 May 1, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 1, 2009, sent
 to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2203 By: Uresti


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the qualifications of surgical technologists;
 providing penalties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subtitle B, Title 4, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 259 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 259.  SURGICAL TECHNOLOGISTS
 AT HEALTH CARE FACILITIES
 Sec. 259.001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Department" means the Department of State Health
 Services.
 (2)  "Surgical technologist" means a person who
 practices surgical technology.
 (3)  "Surgical technology" means intraoperative
 surgical patient care as follows:
 (A)  preparing the operating room for surgical
 procedures by ensuring that surgical equipment is functioning
 properly and safely;
 (B)  preparing the operating room and the sterile
 field for surgical procedures by preparing sterile supplies,
 instruments, and equipment using sterile technique;
 (C)  anticipating the needs of the surgical team
 based on knowledge of human anatomy and pathophysiology and how
 they relate to the surgical patient and the patient's surgical
 procedure;
 (D)  as directed in an operating room setting,
 performing the following tasks at the sterile field:
 (i)  passing supplies, equipment, or
 instruments;
 (ii)  sponging or suctioning an operative
 site;
 (iii)  preparing and cutting suture
 material;
 (iv)  transferring and pouring irrigation
 fluids;
 (v)  transferring but not administering
 drugs within the sterile field;
 (vi) handling specimens;
 (vii)  holding retractors and other
 instruments;
 (viii)  applying electrocautery to clamps on
 bleeders;
 (ix)  connecting drains to suction
 apparatus;
 (x)  applying dressings to closed wounds;
 and
 (xi)  assisting in counting sponges,
 needles, supplies, and instruments with the registered nurse
 circulator;
 (E)  cleaning and preparing instruments for
 sterilization on completion of the surgery; and
 (F)  assisting the surgical team with cleaning of
 the operating room on completion of the surgery.
 Sec. 259.002.  REQUIREMENTS FOR PRACTICING SURGICAL
 TECHNOLOGY. (a)  A health care facility licensed by the department
 under this subtitle or owned or operated by the state may not employ
 a person to practice surgical technology in that health care
 facility unless that person provides evidence that the person:
 (1)  has successfully completed an accredited
 educational program for surgical technologists and holds and
 maintains certification as a surgical technologist by:
 (A)  the National Board of Surgical Technology and
 Surgical Assisting or its successor;
 (B)  the National Center for Competency Testing or
 its successor; or
 (C)  another surgical technologist certification
 program approved by the department;
 (2)  has completed an appropriate training program for
 surgical technology in the army, navy, air force, marine corps, or
 coast guard of the United States or in the United States Public
 Health Service;
 (3)  was employed to practice surgical technology in a
 health care facility before September 1, 2009; or
 (4)  is in the service of the federal government, to the
 extent the person is performing duties related to that service.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), a health care facility
 may employ a person to practice surgical technology at that health
 care facility from the date the person graduates from an accredited
 educational program for surgical technologists until the 180th day
 after the date of graduation. The person may not continue to
 practice surgical technology after the 180th day after the date of
 graduation without showing documentation to the health care
 facility that the person holds and maintains the surgical
 technologist certification required by Subsection (a)(1).
 (c)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), a health care facility
 may employ a surgical technologist who does not meet the
 requirements of this section if:
 (1)  after a diligent and thorough effort has been
 made, the health care facility is unable to employ a sufficient
 number of qualified surgical technologists who meet the
 requirements of this section; and
 (2)  the health care facility makes a written record of
 its efforts under Subdivision (1) and retains the record at the
 health care facility.
 Sec. 259.003.  SUPERVISION OF SURGICAL TECHNOLOGISTS.  This
 chapter does not repeal or modify any law relating to the
 supervision of surgical technologists.
 Sec. 259.004.  OTHER LICENSED PRACTITIONERS. This chapter
 does not prohibit a licensed practitioner from performing a task or
 function within the scope of the practitioner's license.
 Sec. 259.005.  APPLICABILITY. This chapter does not apply
 to:
 (1)  a licensed registered nurse or a licensed
 vocational nurse; or
 (2)  the employment by a health care facility of an
 individual whose primary functions include the cleaning or
 sterilization of supplies, instruments, equipment, or operating
 rooms.
 Sec. 259.006.  ENFORCEMENT. (a)  The department may adopt
 rules to administer and enforce this chapter.
 (b)  A health care facility that violates Section 259.002 is
 subject to an administrative penalty, a civil penalty, or other
 disciplinary action, as applicable, in the same manner as if the
 facility violated the chapter under which the facility is licensed.
 SECTION 2. A health care facility is not required to comply
 with Section 259.002, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act,
 before September 1, 2010.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *