House | 05/21/2009 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 4301 | |
House | 05/21/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4301 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 4074 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2617 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2520 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2520 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2520 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2520 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2520 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2520 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 2519 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Ogden | Journal Page: 2519 |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2519 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2519 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2358 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2223 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 792 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 792 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |