House | 04/30/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 2207 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2207 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1762 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1416 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1325 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1325 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1325 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1324 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1324 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1324 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1324 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1107 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 792 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 792 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |