Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2210 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: West S.B. No. 2210
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 April 16, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 5,
 Nays 0; April 16, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the formula funding for public institutions of higher
 education for certain credit hours that do not count toward a
 degree.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (d), Section 61.0595, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (d) The following are not counted for purposes of
 determining whether the student has previously earned the number of
 semester credit hours specified by Subsection (a):
 (1) semester credit hours earned by the student before
 receiving a baccalaureate degree that has previously been awarded
 to the student;
 (2) semester credit hours earned by the student by
 examination or under any other procedure by which credit is earned
 without registering for a course for which tuition is charged;
 (3) credit for a remedial education course, a
 technical course, a workforce education course funded according to
 contact hours, or another course that does not count toward a degree
 program at the institution; [and]
 (4) semester credit hours earned by the student at a
 private institution or an out-of-state institution; and
 (5)  in addition to semester credit hours excluded
 under another provision of this subsection, not more than 30
 semester credit hours earned through one or more dual credit
 courses for which the student received credit toward a high school
 diploma, if those courses are identified by the board as
 lower-division courses appropriate for general academic transfer
 between institutions of higher education.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act to Section
 61.0595, Education Code, applies beginning with the funding
 recommendations made under Section 61.059, Education Code, for the
 2011-2012 academic year.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *