Senate | 05/14/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 2365 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1997 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 792 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 792 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |