Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2214 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Ellis S.B. No. 2214
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence; May 4, 2009,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote: Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 4, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2214 By: Carona


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a filing fee imposed on a notice of foreclosure sale to
 fund civil legal services for indigents.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 118, Local Government
 Code, is amended by adding Section 118.026 to read as follows:
 Sec. 118.026.  NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE. (a)  A county
 clerk shall collect a $150 fee for a notice of sale filed under
 Section 51.002(b)(2), Property Code, from the holder of the
 security instrument, unless the holder is the original grantee of
 the security instrument. If a property has more than one notice of
 sale filed for the property and the fee has not been refunded under
 Subsection (e), the county clerk may not collect more than one $150
 fee from the holder of the security instrument under this
 subsection.
 (b)  The county clerk shall keep a separate record of the
 fees collected under this section and shall remit the fees to the
 county treasurer not later than the deadline provided by Section
 113.022.  The county may retain not more than five percent of the
 fees for the county's costs for implementing and administering this
 section.
 (c)  On or before the last day of the month following each
 calendar quarter, the county treasurer shall remit to the
 comptroller the money from all fees collected during the preceding
 quarter, except as provided by Subsection (b) or (e).
 (d)  The comptroller shall deposit the money received under
 Subsection (c) in the judicial fund for programs approved by the
 supreme court that provide basic civil legal services to the
 indigent.
 (e)  The county treasurer shall refund a $150 fee collected
 under Subsection (a) not later than the 60th day after the date the
 refund is requested if:
 (1) the foreclosure sale is canceled; and
 (2)  the holder of the security instrument provides to
 the county clerk:
 (A)  documentation establishing that the
 foreclosure sale was canceled; and
 (B)  an affidavit signed by a designated
 representative of the holder of the security instrument indicating
 that the holder has not received reimbursement from the mortgagor
 for the fee.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by Section 118.026, Local
 Government Code, as added by this Act, applies only to a notice of
 sale filed on or after the effective date of this Act. A notice
 filed before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law
 in effect when the notice was filed, and the former law is continued
 in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *