E | 06/19/2009 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5157 | |
E | 06/01/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5156 | |
House | 05/31/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6896 | |
Senate | 05/30/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4680 | |
Senate | 05/28/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4512 | |
Senate | 05/28/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 4132 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Record vote | RV#1376 | Journal Page: 5144 |
House | 05/27/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 5144 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 5144 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 5091 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 5091 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/25/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4315 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/15/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3786 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 3435 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3435 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2455 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2049 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1967 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1967 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1967 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1967 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1967 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1967 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1967 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Shapiro | Journal Page: 1965 |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1965 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1965 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1711 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 796 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 796 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |