Senate | 05/25/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1763 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 797 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 797 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |