1 | 1 | | By: Gallegos S.B. No. 2267 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read |
---|
3 | 3 | | first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education; |
---|
4 | 4 | | April 29, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 3, |
---|
5 | 5 | | Nays 1; April 29, 2009, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
9 | 9 | | AN ACT |
---|
10 | 10 | | relating to eligibility for an award through the Early High School |
---|
11 | 11 | | Graduation Scholarship program. |
---|
12 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
13 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Section 56.203, Education Code, is amended by |
---|
14 | 14 | | amending Subsections (a) and (e) and adding Subsection (f) to read |
---|
15 | 15 | | as follows: |
---|
16 | 16 | | (a) To be eligible for an award through the Early High |
---|
17 | 17 | | School Graduation Scholarship program, a person must: |
---|
18 | 18 | | (1) have graduated from a public high school in this |
---|
19 | 19 | | state: |
---|
20 | 20 | | (A) in not more than 41 consecutive months and |
---|
21 | 21 | | successfully completed the recommended or advanced high school |
---|
22 | 22 | | program established under Section 28.025, if the person graduated |
---|
23 | 23 | | on or after September 1, 2005; |
---|
24 | 24 | | (B) in not more than 46 consecutive months, with |
---|
25 | 25 | | at least 30 hours of college credit, and successfully completed the |
---|
26 | 26 | | recommended or advanced high school program established under |
---|
27 | 27 | | Section 28.025, if the person graduated on or after September 1, |
---|
28 | 28 | | 2005; or |
---|
29 | 29 | | (C) in not more than 36 consecutive months after |
---|
30 | 30 | | successfully completing the requirements for a high school diploma, |
---|
31 | 31 | | if the person graduated before September 1, 2005, regardless of |
---|
32 | 32 | | whether the person successfully completed the recommended or |
---|
33 | 33 | | advanced high school program established under Section 28.025; |
---|
34 | 34 | | (2) have attended one or more public high schools in |
---|
35 | 35 | | this state for the majority of time the person attended high school, |
---|
36 | 36 | | except as provided by Subsection (f); and |
---|
37 | 37 | | (3) except as provided by Subsection (f), be a citizen |
---|
38 | 38 | | of the United States or otherwise lawfully authorized to be present |
---|
39 | 39 | | in the United States. |
---|
40 | 40 | | (e) The coordinating board shall adopt rules for |
---|
41 | 41 | | determining whether a person attended public high school in this |
---|
42 | 42 | | state as required by Subsection (a)(2) and for determining under |
---|
43 | 43 | | Subsection (f)(2) whether a person attended a high school other |
---|
44 | 44 | | than a public high school in this state primarily because of the |
---|
45 | 45 | | migratory agricultural or fishing work of the person, the person's |
---|
46 | 46 | | parent, or the person's spouse. The coordinating board may adopt |
---|
47 | 47 | | other rules the board considers necessary for the administration of |
---|
48 | 48 | | Subsection (f). |
---|
49 | 49 | | (f) A person described by Subsection (a)(1)(A) or (B) who is |
---|
50 | 50 | | otherwise eligible for an award and who is a migratory child, as |
---|
51 | 51 | | defined by 20 U.S.C. Section 6399, is eligible for an award through |
---|
52 | 52 | | the Early High School Graduation Scholarship program despite the |
---|
53 | 53 | | student's inability to satisfy Subsection (a)(2) or (3) if: |
---|
54 | 54 | | (1) the person graduates from a public high school in |
---|
55 | 55 | | this state; and |
---|
56 | 56 | | (2) the person attended one or more high schools, |
---|
57 | 57 | | other than a public high school in this state, for one or more |
---|
58 | 58 | | periods primarily because of the migratory agricultural or fishing |
---|
59 | 59 | | work of the person, the person's parent, or the person's spouse, and |
---|
60 | 60 | | the person would have satisfied Subsection (a)(2) if the person had |
---|
61 | 61 | | attended a public high school in this state during that period or |
---|
62 | 62 | | those periods. |
---|
63 | 63 | | SECTION 2. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to |
---|
64 | 64 | | a student who graduates from a public high school in this state on |
---|
65 | 65 | | or after the effective date of this Act. A student who graduates |
---|
66 | 66 | | from a public high school in this state before the effective date of |
---|
67 | 67 | | this Act and the student's eligibility to participate in the Early |
---|
68 | 68 | | High School Graduation Scholarship program is governed by the law |
---|
69 | 69 | | in effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and the |
---|
70 | 70 | | former law is continued in effect for that purpose. |
---|
71 | 71 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
72 | 72 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
73 | 73 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
74 | 74 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
75 | 75 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
76 | 76 | | * * * * * |
---|